THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mountdale Family Health Clinic
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 577-5676
Fax: (807) 577-7911
Address: Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807)684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fairway Physiotherapy -Sport Med
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8
Phone: (807)344-5242
Fax: (807)344-5042
Address: 955 Oliver Road
Thunderwolves Varsity Therapy Centre
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Phone: 807-343-8180
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8936
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: WARK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wark (CPSO#: 95502 )
Business Address: 236 College Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5K1
8076291413

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mountdale Family Health Clinic
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 577-5676
Fax: (807) 577-7911
Address: Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807)684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fairway Physiotherapy -Sport Med
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8
Phone: (807)344-5242
Fax: (807)344-5042
Address: 955 Oliver Road
Thunderwolves Varsity Therapy Centre
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Phone: 807-343-8180
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8936
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: WARK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wark (CPSO#: 95502 )
Business Address: 236 College Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5K1
8076291413

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERYL CATHERINE WARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERYL CATHERINE WARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011