THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8760 Jane St
Suite 204A
Concord ON L4K 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058894040
Fax: 9058894848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tuba Aksoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8760 Jane St
Suite 204A
Concord ON L4K 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058894040
Fax: 9058894848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tuba Aksoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUBA AKSOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKSOY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUBA AKSOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKSOY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011