THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:21:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Furheen Iftikhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Iftikhar (CPSO#: 95539 )
Business Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Furheen Iftikhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Iftikhar (CPSO#: 95539 )
Business Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FURHEEN IFTIKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IFTIKHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FURHEEN IFTIKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IFTIKHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011