THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:14:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rheumatology Clinic
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2-163
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6319
Fax: (519) 646-6406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Thomas G. Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Appleton (CPSO#: 95559 )
Business Address: Rheumatology Clinic
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2-163
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000 Extn: 66333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rheumatology Clinic
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2-163
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6319
Fax: (519) 646-6406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Thomas G. Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Appleton (CPSO#: 95559 )
Business Address: Rheumatology Clinic
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2-163
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000 Extn: 66333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS GEORGE APPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPLETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS GEORGE APPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPLETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011