THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:52:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 24042
Kanata ON K2M 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-476-2181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sara-Anne Arul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arul (CPSO#: 95576 )
Business Address: 4 - 35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 471-1906

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 24042
Kanata ON K2M 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-476-2181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sara-Anne Arul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arul (CPSO#: 95576 )
Business Address: 4 - 35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 471-1906

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA-ANNE ARUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA-ANNE ARUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011