THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:51:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F 33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick Dong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Dong (CPSO#: 95601 )
Business Address: Pacific Medical Clinic
F33 - 4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
(905) 604-7889

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F 33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick Dong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Dong (CPSO#: 95601 )
Business Address: Pacific Medical Clinic
F33 - 4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
(905) 604-7889

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERICK FUNG TIK DONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERICK FUNG TIK DONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011