THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 316 Rideau Street
Suite 2
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Milkereit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Milkereit (CPSO#: 95614 )
Business Address: Byward Family Health Team
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950
Business Address: 316 Rideau Street
Suite 2
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A3
613-564-3950

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 316 Rideau Street
Suite 2
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Milkereit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Milkereit (CPSO#: 95614 )
Business Address: Byward Family Health Team
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950
Business Address: 316 Rideau Street
Suite 2
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A3
613-564-3950

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAIKE-SVENJA MILKEREIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKEREIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAIKE-SVENJA MILKEREIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKEREIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011