THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Department of Gynaecology
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 5577
Fax: 416-238-8139
Address: 600 University Ave
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JG Thorne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thorne (CPSO#: 95620 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
416-323-6400
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6

Corporation Name: JG Thorne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Department of Gynaecology
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 5577
Fax: 416-238-8139
Address: 600 University Ave
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JG Thorne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thorne (CPSO#: 95620 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
416-323-6400
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6

Corporation Name: JG Thorne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE GABRIELLE THORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE GABRIELLE THORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011