THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
Suite 204
230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 873-1447
Fax: (519) 873-1448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cowger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cowger (CPSO#: 95642 )
Business Address: Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
204 - 230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2
(519) 873-1447

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
Suite 204
230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 873-1447
Fax: (519) 873-1448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cowger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cowger (CPSO#: 95642 )
Business Address: Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
204 - 230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2
(519) 873-1447

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERY JOHN MICHAEL COWGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERY JOHN MICHAEL COWGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011