THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:31:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Segal Mattia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mattia (CPSO#: 95647 ) Dr. D. Segal (CPSO#: 95765 )
Business Address: 3250 Schmon Parkway
Unit 10
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(289) 479-0223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Segal Mattia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mattia (CPSO#: 95647 ) Dr. D. Segal (CPSO#: 95765 )
Business Address: 3250 Schmon Parkway
Unit 10
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(289) 479-0223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICIA MARIE MATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICIA MARIE MATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011