THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:17:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 201
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-252-9393
Fax: 705-417-3611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dorotea Mutabdzic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mutabdzic (CPSO#: 95654 )
Business Address: 1 Quarry Ridge Road, Suite LL4
Barrie ON L4M7G1
7052529393

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 201
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-252-9393
Fax: 705-417-3611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dorotea Mutabdzic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mutabdzic (CPSO#: 95654 )
Business Address: 1 Quarry Ridge Road, Suite LL4
Barrie ON L4M7G1
7052529393

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTEA MUTABDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTABDZIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTEA MUTABDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTABDZIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011