THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:37:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baroda University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5 Room 548
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Archana Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel (CPSO#: 95658 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5 Room 548
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Baroda University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5 Room 548
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Archana Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel (CPSO#: 95658 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5 Room 548
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARCHANA DHARMESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARCHANA DHARMESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baroda University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011