THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:40:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 603
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-4448
Fax: (905) 853-7411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Wong-Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong-Chong (CPSO#: 95674 )
Business Address: Medical Arts Building
Suite 611 & 603
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 853-4448
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 603
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-4448
Fax: (905) 853-7411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Wong-Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong-Chong (CPSO#: 95674 )
Business Address: Medical Arts Building
Suite 611 & 603
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 853-4448
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE WONG-CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG-CHONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE WONG-CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG-CHONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011