THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:59:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Pediatric Clinic, Box 139
381 Church St
Markham, ON
Toronto Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7534
Fax: 905-472-7535

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Coles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Coles (CPSO#: 95694 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7534
Business Address: 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
(416) 250-9248

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Pediatric Clinic, Box 139
381 Church St
Markham, ON
Toronto Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7534
Fax: 905-472-7535

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Coles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Coles (CPSO#: 95694 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7534
Business Address: 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
(416) 250-9248

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ADRIENNE COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ADRIENNE COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011