THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:21:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 184 Marina Boulevard
#6
Peterborough Ontario K9H 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 743 1004
Extension: 2
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.C. Pallett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pallett (CPSO#: 95714 )
Business Address: 26 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Business Address: 206 Mallory Terrace
Peterborough Ontario K9H 0C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 184 Marina Boulevard
#6
Peterborough Ontario K9H 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 743 1004
Extension: 2
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.C. Pallett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pallett (CPSO#: 95714 )
Business Address: 26 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Business Address: 206 Mallory Terrace
Peterborough Ontario K9H 0C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN CHRISTOPHER PALLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN CHRISTOPHER PALLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011