THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:57:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7700
Extension: 70170
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry L. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ng (CPSO#: 95715 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70170

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7700
Extension: 70170
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry L. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ng (CPSO#: 95715 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70170

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY L NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY L NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011