THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:10:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheung (CPSO#: 95735 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheung (CPSO#: 95735 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN MAN-CHING CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN MAN-CHING CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011