THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Deboer-Fennell, Heidi Lauren (Used Until: 22 Oct 2023) Deboer, Heidi Lauren (Used Until: 13 Aug 2013)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 847 Vindin Street
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-558-4091
Fax: 705-558-4098
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deboer-Fennell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Deboer (CPSO#: 95742 )
Business Address: 847 Vindin Street
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9

Corporation Name: Deboer-Fennell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: Deboer-Fennell, Heidi Lauren (Used Until: 22 Oct 2023) Deboer, Heidi Lauren (Used Until: 13 Aug 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 847 Vindin Street
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-558-4091
Fax: 705-558-4098
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deboer-Fennell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Deboer (CPSO#: 95742 )
Business Address: 847 Vindin Street
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9

Corporation Name: Deboer-Fennell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEIDI LAUREN DEBOER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBOER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEIDI LAUREN DEBOER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBOER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011