THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-520 Ellesmere Rd
Diabetes Education Program - SCHC
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-847-4160
Fax: 416-283-1057
Address: 17-1450 Kingston Rd
Diabetes Education Program - DCHC
Pickering ON L1V 1C1
Phone: 905-723-0036 x1268
Fax: 905-723-3391
Address: 629 Markham Road, Unit 2
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A4
Phone: (416) 847-4160
Fax: 416-283-1057
Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 7-NU
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 4609
Fax: 416 340 3750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Sivabalasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sivabalasundaram (CPSO#: 95775 )
Business Address: 100-1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719
Business Address: 2-629 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A4
(416) 847-4160
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 7-NU
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4609
Business Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
(416) 335-1717

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-520 Ellesmere Rd
Diabetes Education Program - SCHC
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-847-4160
Fax: 416-283-1057
Address: 17-1450 Kingston Rd
Diabetes Education Program - DCHC
Pickering ON L1V 1C1
Phone: 905-723-0036 x1268
Fax: 905-723-3391
Address: 629 Markham Road, Unit 2
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A4
Phone: (416) 847-4160
Fax: 416-283-1057
Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 7-NU
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 4609
Fax: 416 340 3750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Sivabalasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sivabalasundaram (CPSO#: 95775 )
Business Address: 100-1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719
Business Address: 2-629 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A4
(416) 847-4160
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 7-NU
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4609
Business Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
(416) 335-1717

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VITHIKA SIVABALASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVABALASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VITHIKA SIVABALASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVABALASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011