THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059350312
Fax: 9059352949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nigel S. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tan (CPSO#: 95782 )
Business Address: 35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059350312
Fax: 9059352949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nigel S. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tan (CPSO#: 95782 )
Business Address: 35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIGEL SHIH-YEN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIGEL SHIH-YEN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011