THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: 416-340-3799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abdulrehman (CPSO#: 95789 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: ABDULREHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: 416-340-3799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abdulrehman (CPSO#: 95789 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: ABDULREHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMEEL ABDULREHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULREHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMEEL ABDULREHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULREHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011