THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quinte Health Care
Emergency Department
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Extension: 6229
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hastings Prince Edward Public Healt
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft
Bancroft Ontario K0K3E0
Phone: 613-332-5692
Fax: 613-332-5749
Address: Belleville General Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
265 Dundas St E
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V5S6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parambir S. Keila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Keila (CPSO#: 95800 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quinte Health Care
Emergency Department
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Extension: 6229
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hastings Prince Edward Public Healt
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft
Bancroft Ontario K0K3E0
Phone: 613-332-5692
Fax: 613-332-5749
Address: Belleville General Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
265 Dundas St E
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V5S6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parambir S. Keila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Keila (CPSO#: 95800 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAMBIR SINGH KEILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEILA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAMBIR SINGH KEILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEILA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011