THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:52:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 2255
Fax: 416-597-3064
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6400
Extension: 5580
Fax: 416-323-6215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Xi and Dr. Howard An Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. An (CPSO#: 96228 ) Dr. N. Xi (CPSO#: 95807 )
Business Address: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
416-597-3422 Extn: 2255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 2255
Fax: 416-597-3064
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6400
Extension: 5580
Fax: 416-323-6215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Xi and Dr. Howard An Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. An (CPSO#: 96228 ) Dr. N. Xi (CPSO#: 95807 )
Business Address: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
416-597-3422 Extn: 2255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NENG NANCY XI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NENG NANCY XI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011