THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-6060
Extension: 3868
Fax: (416) 864-5621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Catapano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Catapano (CPSO#: 95813 )
Business Address: 149 College St
Fl 5 Rm 508
Toronto ON M5T 1P5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-6060
Extension: 3868
Fax: (416) 864-5621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Catapano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Catapano (CPSO#: 95813 )
Business Address: 149 College St
Fl 5 Rm 508
Toronto ON M5T 1P5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH CATAPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATAPANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH CATAPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATAPANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011