THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Peel Family Health Team
Suite 301
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 791-5822
Fax: 905 791-5493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salini Gopalapillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gopalapillai (CPSO#: 95820 )
Business Address: North Peel Family Health Team
Suite 301
18 Kensington Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(905) 791-5822

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Peel Family Health Team
Suite 301
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 791-5822
Fax: 905 791-5493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salini Gopalapillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gopalapillai (CPSO#: 95820 )
Business Address: North Peel Family Health Team
Suite 301
18 Kensington Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(905) 791-5822

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALINI GOPALAPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPALAPILLAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALINI GOPALAPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPALAPILLAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011