THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:22:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carly Rogenstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rogenstein (CPSO#: 95836 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carly Rogenstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rogenstein (CPSO#: 95836 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLY DANIELLE ROGENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGENSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLY DANIELLE ROGENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011