THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:36:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NIagara Urology Associates Inc
3350 Merrittvillle Highway
Unit #2
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Extension: 3
Fax: 905-641-7515
Address: Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy R. Tatzel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tatzel (CPSO#: 95837 ) Dr. T. Tatzel (CPSO#: 52060 )
Business Address: Thorold Medical Clinic
60 Albert Street West
Thorold Ontario L2V 2G7
(905) 227-5255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NIagara Urology Associates Inc
3350 Merrittvillle Highway
Unit #2
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Extension: 3
Fax: 905-641-7515
Address: Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy R. Tatzel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tatzel (CPSO#: 95837 ) Dr. T. Tatzel (CPSO#: 52060 )
Business Address: Thorold Medical Clinic
60 Albert Street West
Thorold Ontario L2V 2G7
(905) 227-5255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARIE TATZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATZEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARIE TATZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATZEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011