THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:36:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 2843450
Fax: 519 284 2125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Trevail & C. Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trevail (CPSO#: 95841 ) Dr. C. Barrett (CPSO#: 95849 )
Business Address: Suite 201
1807 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 5C2
(519) 433-4330
Business Address: Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 2843450
Fax: 519 284 2125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Trevail & C. Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trevail (CPSO#: 95841 ) Dr. C. Barrett (CPSO#: 95849 )
Business Address: Suite 201
1807 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 5C2
(519) 433-4330
Business Address: Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES TREVAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREVAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES TREVAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREVAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011