THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-3399
Fax: (905) 592-2325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asif Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ashraf (CPSO#: 95847 )
Business Address: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 662-3399
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8W3J2
9056623399

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-3399
Fax: (905) 592-2325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asif Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ashraf (CPSO#: 95847 )
Business Address: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 662-3399
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8W3J2
9056623399

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIF EQBAL ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIF EQBAL ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011