THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Extension: 51502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Brassard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brassard (CPSO#: 95851 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Address: Canadian Forces Health Services Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Extension: 51502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Brassard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brassard (CPSO#: 95851 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Address: Canadian Forces Health Services Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANE JOSEPH LEGER BRASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASSARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANE JOSEPH LEGER BRASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRASSARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011