THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:32:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Dewhirst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dewhirst (CPSO#: 95854 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 19002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Dewhirst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dewhirst (CPSO#: 95854 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 19002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN DEWHIRST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEWHIRST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN DEWHIRST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEWHIRST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011