THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4298
Address: Factor Dermatology
770 Broadview Avenue
Suite 206
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613-691-1646
Fax: 613-907-3099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Gavigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gavigan (CPSO#: 95857 )
Business Address: Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
2144 - 43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6354
Business Address: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4298
Address: Factor Dermatology
770 Broadview Avenue
Suite 206
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613-691-1646
Fax: 613-907-3099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Gavigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gavigan (CPSO#: 95857 )
Business Address: Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
2144 - 43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6354
Business Address: 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE GAVIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAVIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE GAVIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAVIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011