THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:32:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Leclair, Emily (Used Until: 14 Dec 2014)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynecology
1053 Carling avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 152 Cleopatra drive, suite 101
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: 613-728-6212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Walker (CPSO#: 95861 )
Business Address: 152 Cleopatra Dr
Suite 101
Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
613 562-5600

General Information

Former Name: Leclair, Emily (Used Until: 14 Dec 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynecology
1053 Carling avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 152 Cleopatra drive, suite 101
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: 613-728-6212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Walker (CPSO#: 95861 )
Business Address: 152 Cleopatra Dr
Suite 101
Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
613 562-5600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011