THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:48:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-288-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Andre Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy (CPSO#: 95874 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P3
(705) 288-1000
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-288-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Andre Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy (CPSO#: 95874 )
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P3
(705) 288-1000
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011