THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:48:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Extension: 4800
Fax: 905-845-6419
Address: 102-1540 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7W5
Phone: (888) 388-7226
Fax: (905) 514-4000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaytzag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaytzag (CPSO#: 95877 )
Business Address: Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Extension: 4800
Fax: 905-845-6419
Address: 102-1540 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7W5
Phone: (888) 388-7226
Fax: (905) 514-4000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaytzag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaytzag (CPSO#: 95877 )
Business Address: Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DANIEL SHAYTZAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYTZAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DANIEL SHAYTZAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYTZAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011