THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 22:12:56 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
301 James St S, 2F- Fontbonne Build
L8P 3B6
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905)383-3336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Shea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shea (CPSO#: 95878 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2F - Fontbonne Building
301 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6
(905) 521-6041

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
301 James St S, 2F- Fontbonne Build
L8P 3B6
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905)383-3336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Shea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shea (CPSO#: 95878 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2F - Fontbonne Building
301 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6
(905) 521-6041

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON KATHLEEN AUDREY SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON KATHLEEN AUDREY SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011