THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 Woolwich Street
Unit C
Guelph Ontario N1H 3W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193413344
Fax: 5193414433
Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 5198225350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Limestone City Sleep Lab
110- 920 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L1H1
Phone: 6135479172
Fax: 6135479910
Address: Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
2100 Ellesmere Road, Suite 326
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Wilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilton (CPSO#: 95883 )
Business Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
(416) 813-2277
Business Address: Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
326-2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3B7
Business Address: Medsleep
101 - 920 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Division of Respirology
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 311 Woolwich Street
Unit C
Guelph Ontario N1H 3W4
5193413344
Business Address: 207 Woolwich St
Guelph ON N1H 3V4
5193413344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 Woolwich Street
Unit C
Guelph Ontario N1H 3W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193413344
Fax: 5193414433
Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 5198225350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Limestone City Sleep Lab
110- 920 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L1H1
Phone: 6135479172
Fax: 6135479910
Address: Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
2100 Ellesmere Road, Suite 326
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Wilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilton (CPSO#: 95883 )
Business Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
(416) 813-2277
Business Address: Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
326-2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3B7
Business Address: Medsleep
101 - 920 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Division of Respirology
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 311 Woolwich Street
Unit C
Guelph Ontario N1H 3W4
5193413344
Business Address: 207 Woolwich St
Guelph ON N1H 3V4
5193413344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011