THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 605 Royal York Rd
Citrus Medical Centre
Etobicoke ON M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-800-6500
Fax: 416-342-1790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Bertucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertucci (CPSO#: 95907 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 605 Royal York Rd
Citrus Medical Centre
Etobicoke ON M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-800-6500
Fax: 416-342-1790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Bertucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertucci (CPSO#: 95907 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011