THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:14:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Academic FHT
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefan de Laplante Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. de Laplante (CPSO#: 95911 )
Business Address: Hospital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Montfort Academic Family Health
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
(613) 749-4429

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Academic FHT
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefan de Laplante Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. de Laplante (CPSO#: 95911 )
Business Address: Hospital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Montfort Academic Family Health
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
(613) 749-4429

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFAN PIERRE ROGER DE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFAN PIERRE ROGER DE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011