THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:03:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ASSYRIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5775 Bath Road
Millhaven Institution
Correctional Service Canada
Health Services
Bath Ontario K0H 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133518229
Fax: 6133518230
Address: 508 Portsmouth Ave
Kingston ON K7M 1V8
Phone: 6139856774
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1455 Bath Road
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V9
Phone: (613) 536-6047
Fax: (613) 536-6051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eshay Elia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elia (CPSO#: 95914 )
Business Address: 1455 Bath Road
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V9
(613) 536-6047
Business Address: Highway 33
PO Box 280
Bath Ontario K0H 1G0
(613) 351-8000
Business Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ASSYRIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5775 Bath Road
Millhaven Institution
Correctional Service Canada
Health Services
Bath Ontario K0H 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133518229
Fax: 6133518230
Address: 508 Portsmouth Ave
Kingston ON K7M 1V8
Phone: 6139856774
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1455 Bath Road
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V9
Phone: (613) 536-6047
Fax: (613) 536-6051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eshay Elia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elia (CPSO#: 95914 )
Business Address: 1455 Bath Road
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V9
(613) 536-6047
Business Address: Highway 33
PO Box 280
Bath Ontario K0H 1G0
(613) 351-8000
Business Address: 146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESHAY ELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESHAY ELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011