THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Synergy
Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto Ontario M6H1V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-703-3525
Fax: 647-343-8073
Address: Camp Arowhon, Algonquin Park
Box 10002
Huntsville Ontario P1H2G6
Phone: 705.633.5651
Fax: 705.633.5663
Address: 1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Hull-Ellis Concussion Clinic
10th Floor
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 3226
Fax: 416-597-7169

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Jansen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jansen (CPSO#: 95921 )
Business Address: Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6H 1V5
(416) 703-3525
Business Address: 235 Wallace Ave
Synergy Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON M6H 1V5
416-703-3525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Synergy
Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto Ontario M6H1V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-703-3525
Fax: 647-343-8073
Address: Camp Arowhon, Algonquin Park
Box 10002
Huntsville Ontario P1H2G6
Phone: 705.633.5651
Fax: 705.633.5663
Address: 1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Hull-Ellis Concussion Clinic
10th Floor
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 3226
Fax: 416-597-7169

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Jansen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jansen (CPSO#: 95921 )
Business Address: Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6H 1V5
(416) 703-3525
Business Address: 235 Wallace Ave
Synergy Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON M6H 1V5
416-703-3525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS COLE JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS COLE JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011