THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-257-2311
Extension: 3
Fax: 343-763-2983

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KATHRYN KIPP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kipp (CPSO#: 95923 )
Business Address: 299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-257-2311
Extension: 3
Fax: 343-763-2983

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KATHRYN KIPP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kipp (CPSO#: 95923 )
Business Address: 299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN MELISSA ELLEN KIPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN MELISSA ELLEN KIPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011