THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:33:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kandel, Christopher (Used Until: 22 Jun 2011)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-469-6252
Fax: 416-469-6253
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3505
Fax: 416-340-3357
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6252
Fax: 416-469-6253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTOPHER KANDEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kandel (CPSO#: 95948 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabor Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kandel (CPSO#: 50880 ) Dr. G. Kandel (CPSO#: 50879 ) Dr. C. Kandel (CPSO#: 95948 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 16-060
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-3093

General Information

Former Name: Kandel, Christopher (Used Until: 22 Jun 2011)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-469-6252
Fax: 416-469-6253
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3505
Fax: 416-340-3357
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6252
Fax: 416-469-6253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTOPHER KANDEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kandel (CPSO#: 95948 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabor Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kandel (CPSO#: 50880 ) Dr. G. Kandel (CPSO#: 50879 ) Dr. C. Kandel (CPSO#: 95948 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 16-060
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-3093

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDWARD KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDWARD KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011