THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 23:52:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-9889 Markham Rd
Markham ON L6E 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-305-8687
Fax: 289-469-5899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical records requests, please call 905-305-8687
Date Received: 02 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Tsao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsao (CPSO#: 95957 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-9889 Markham Rd
Markham ON L6E 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-305-8687
Fax: 289-469-5899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical records requests, please call 905-305-8687
Date Received: 02 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Tsao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsao (CPSO#: 95957 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA LIH-PIN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA LIH-PIN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011