THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:23:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road Suite #103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
Phone: 905-387-4551
Fax: (905) 387-1966
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian van der Pol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. van der Pol (CPSO#: 95958 )
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road Suite #103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
Phone: 905-387-4551
Fax: (905) 387-1966
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian van der Pol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. van der Pol (CPSO#: 95958 )
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 2V8
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN BALTHASAR VAN DER POL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER POL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN BALTHASAR VAN DER POL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER POL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011