THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:57:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1229 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6K 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416‑537‑2455
Fax: 416‑537‑3526
Address: 205 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3T2G8
Phone: 519-758-5800
Fax: 519-758-5801
Address: Caledonia Clinic
1-53 Argyle St N
Caledonia ON N3W 1B8
Phone: (905) 765-5885
Fax: (905) 765-7887
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5721
Fax: 4166032782
Address: 1901 Weston Rd
York ON M9N 3P5
Phone: 647-581-5007
Fax: 1-855-274-0007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasemin Akcakir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Akcakir (CPSO#: 95967 )
Business Address: 1901 Weston Rd
York ON M9N 3P5
Business Address: Caledonia Clinic
1-53 Argyle St N
Caledonia ON N3W 1B8
Business Address: 205 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3T 2H2
(519) 758-5800
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1229 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6K 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416‑537‑2455
Fax: 416‑537‑3526
Address: 205 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3T2G8
Phone: 519-758-5800
Fax: 519-758-5801
Address: Caledonia Clinic
1-53 Argyle St N
Caledonia ON N3W 1B8
Phone: (905) 765-5885
Fax: (905) 765-7887
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5721
Fax: 4166032782
Address: 1901 Weston Rd
York ON M9N 3P5
Phone: 647-581-5007
Fax: 1-855-274-0007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasemin Akcakir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Akcakir (CPSO#: 95967 )
Business Address: 1901 Weston Rd
York ON M9N 3P5
Business Address: Caledonia Clinic
1-53 Argyle St N
Caledonia ON N3W 1B8
Business Address: 205 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3T 2H2
(519) 758-5800
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASEMIN AKCAKIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKCAKIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASEMIN AKCAKIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKCAKIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011