THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:59:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hamilton, Lawrie Jean Marion (Used Until: 19 Feb 2018)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ray (CPSO#: 95983 )
Business Address: 36 Bernier Terrace
Ottawa Ontario K2L 2V2
Business Address: 95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0

General Information

Former Name: Hamilton, Lawrie Jean Marion (Used Until: 19 Feb 2018)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ray (CPSO#: 95983 )
Business Address: 36 Bernier Terrace
Ottawa Ontario K2L 2V2
Business Address: 95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRIE JEAN MARION RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRIE JEAN MARION RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011