THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7314
Fax: (705) 523-7340
Address: 70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Phone: 7058487181
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H5
Phone: 7053376111
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 11 Meredith Street
Little Current Ontario P0P 1K0
Phone: 7053682300
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 421 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: 7056478121
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 3A4
Phone: 7057464540
Fax: 7055237340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Paul Harmon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harmon (CPSO#: 95984 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7314
Business Address: 11 Meredith Street
Little Current Ontario P0P 1K0
Business Address: 101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Address: 70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Business Address: 145 Government Road West
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7314
Fax: (705) 523-7340
Address: 70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Phone: 7058487181
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H5
Phone: 7053376111
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 11 Meredith Street
Little Current Ontario P0P 1K0
Phone: 7053682300
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 421 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: 7056478121
Fax: 7055237340
Address: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 3A4
Phone: 7057464540
Fax: 7055237340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Paul Harmon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harmon (CPSO#: 95984 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7314
Business Address: 11 Meredith Street
Little Current Ontario P0P 1K0
Business Address: 101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Address: 70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Business Address: 145 Government Road West
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL HARMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL HARMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011