THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Medical Arts Clinic
301 - 272 Charlotte St
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-876-9003
Fax: 705-874-5410

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reid Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chambers (CPSO#: 95989 )
Business Address: 301 - 272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 876-9003

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Medical Arts Clinic
301 - 272 Charlotte St
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-876-9003
Fax: 705-874-5410

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reid Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chambers (CPSO#: 95989 )
Business Address: 301 - 272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 876-9003

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REID WILLIAM CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REID WILLIAM CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011