THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elisabeth BruyŠre Hospital
43 BruyŠre Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Extension: 4010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2244 Innes Road
Ottawa-Carleton Detention Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1B 4C4
Phone: (613) 824-6080
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thomson (CPSO#: 96129 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Department of Care of the Elderly
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
613-562-6262
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 2244 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1B 4C4
(613) 824-6080

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elisabeth BruyŠre Hospital
43 BruyŠre Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Extension: 4010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2244 Innes Road
Ottawa-Carleton Detention Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1B 4C4
Phone: (613) 824-6080
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thomson (CPSO#: 96129 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Department of Care of the Elderly
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
613-562-6262
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 2244 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1B 4C4
(613) 824-6080

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET EVELYN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET EVELYN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011